U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03605
  • Case Name: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. MANHATTANVIEW OPERATIONS, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 30, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.