U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00159
  • Case Name: AHMAD ZAVITSANOS & MENSING PLLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 14, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.