U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00573
  • Case Name: POUR et al v. RUBIO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 21, 2025: [Pro Se Electronic Noticing Form]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 14, 2025: [Supplemental Memorandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.