U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00345
  • Case Name: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.