U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03628
  • Case Name: BUENO VALDOVINOS v. COLVIN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 07, 2025: [Remand to Agency]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment of Reversal]
  • April 04, 2025: [.Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.