U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00092-
  • Case Name: Satoya Peoples
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Discharge Order to Show Cause (Case Admin)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Returned Mail]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [eNoticing Request Form]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Returned Mail]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Show Cause Failure To Pay Installments]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File A Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.