U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00091-
  • Case Name: Shannon Robinson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Appearance (Add Party to Matrix)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order To Show Cause]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Have the Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Held (BK)]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Deficiency Letter - Pleading(s)/Document(s)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule D]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Summary Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Intent (Original or Amended)]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (BK)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Hearing - Scheduled (BK)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Service - Ntc of Requirement to File Stmt of Completion of Mgmt Course]
  • March 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Deficiency Letter - Case Opening]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors - Notice Sent to BNC]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Notice Of Requirement To File A Certificate of Debtor Education]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Original or Amended)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules - Form 106Dec]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule J]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule I]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule H]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule G]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule E/F]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule C]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Schedule A/B]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [List of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Original or Amended)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Statement of Your Social Security Numbers - Form 121 (Original or Amended)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Webster, Wendell W. [First Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.