U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00113
  • Case Name: TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al v. BECERRA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.