U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03360
  • Case Name: DOE v. BOZZUTO MANAGEMENT COMPANY
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 10, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • April 19, 2025: [Seal Case]
  • April 19, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 19, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.