U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00273
  • Case Name: DOES v. DEMOCRATIC PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF KOREA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Sealed Document]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Telephone Conference]
  • March 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 21, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.