U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03611
  • Case Name: TOASTIQUE HOLDINGS, LLC v. C & G RESTAURANT HOLDINGS, INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.