U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00441
  • Case Name: HALLINAN v. AVERILL
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Case Stayed]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: [Remand to Agency]
  • May 05, 2025: [Stay]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.