U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00764
  • Case Name: SAUNDERS v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.