U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00286
  • Case Name: DOE et al v. MCHENRY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • May 12, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal/Party]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Case Stayed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 02, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Opposition]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.