U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00536
  • Case Name: VANDA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • May 09, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Errata]
  • May 02, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 28, 2025: [Administrative Record]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Pre-motion Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.