U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00403
  • Case Name: MENNONITE CHURCH USA et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Case Stayed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 18, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 11, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • April 09, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 19, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.