U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00766
  • Case Name: J.G.G. et al v. TRUMP et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • May 11, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • May 11, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • May 09, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 07, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 29, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • April 28, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 25, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 24, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • April 24, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 19, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: [Expedite]
  • April 18, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • April 16, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 16, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 11, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 03, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • April 03, 2025: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • March 27, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Intervene]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
  • March 25, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 16, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • March 16, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 16, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • March 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 15, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 15, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • March 15, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • March 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 15, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 15, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certify Class]
  • March 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.