U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00762
  • Case Name: POWER FORWARD COMMUNITIES, INC. v. CITIBANK, N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Create Case Association]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 16, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 15, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 15, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 15, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 14, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.