U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00771
  • Case Name: BOBULINSKI v. HUTCHINSON
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • March 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 25, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Standing Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Transferring Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.