U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00767
  • Case Name: FIX THE COURT v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.