U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00616
  • Case Name: BOSS v. PILLSBURY WINTHROP SHAW PITTMAN
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Errata]
  • May 06, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • May 06, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Reissued]
  • April 30, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 09, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 08, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 03, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Joinder]
  • March 17, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.