U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00409
  • Case Name: AMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF GOVERNMENT EFFICIENCY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Status Report]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 02, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.