U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00658
  • Case Name: RECTOR v. WALMART INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.