U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-03675
  • Case Name: INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK v. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Errata]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.