U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00452
  • Case Name: WILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. BURGUM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to DC Government Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.