U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00779
  • Case Name: JAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 20, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.