U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03259
  • Case Name: MEJIA v. ARAMARK SERVICES, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Mediation (Circuit Executive's Office)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.