U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00778
  • Case Name: AVIEL v. GOR et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • May 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • May 07, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 06, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 06, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 04, 2025: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [Status Report Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 18, 2025: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Request for Subpoenas to Issue]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Error- New Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.