U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00746
  • Case Name: VISCONTI v. PINTO et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Errata]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Errata]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.