U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00040
  • Case Name: TALLY v. NEIGHBORHOOD REINVESTMENT CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • April 04, 2025: [Meet and Confer Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.