U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01528
  • Case Name: STEINARSDOTTIR v. TRIPSCOUT, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Proposed Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 08, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.