U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00043
  • Case Name: UCHENNA v. BORROUGHS et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Discovery Request]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 03, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Crossclaim]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.