U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00462
  • Case Name: ALHAMWI v. NOEM et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • April 28, 2025: [Case Transferred Out]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transfer Case]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.