U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00791
  • Case Name: E.Q. et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • May 09, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance- Pro Bono]
  • March 19, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Sealed Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.