U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00793
  • Case Name: CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. ZELDIN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [.Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Related Case]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.