U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03638
  • Case Name: CANNADY v. KYNDRYL HOLDINGS, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • April 23, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for CM/ECF Password]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [CM/ECF Password]
  • March 27, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 27, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 18, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.