U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02928
  • Case Name: INKO-TARIAH v. CAPITAL ONE ARENA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 18, 2025: [Fox/Neal Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Request for Subpoenas to Issue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.