U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00654
  • Case Name: CAVIC v. MAVEN ENGINEERING CORPORATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.