U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00531
  • Case Name: HOPKINS et al v. GIANT LANDOVER STORES, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
  • March 19, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.