U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00804
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES INSTITUTE OF PEACE et al v. JACKSON et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amicus Brief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Intervene]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 05, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Telephone Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of QC **DO NOT USE- FOR REPORTING PURPOSES ONLY.**]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Motion For Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 19, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.