U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00799
  • Case Name: RFE/RL, INC. v. LAKE et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 01, 2025: [Errata]
  • May 01, 2025: [Status Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 29, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Consent to the filing of an Amended Complaint]
  • April 13, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 13, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 12, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • April 12, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 09, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [.Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 23, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 23, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 19, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 18, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.