U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00061
  • Case Name: AXELRAD et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Certificate of Clerk -1608(a)(4)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Request -1608(a)(4)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Affidavit Requesting Foreign Mailing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • March 24, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • March 19, 2025: [Request for Summons to Issue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.