U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00710
  • Case Name: GREER v. BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSIY OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Response to motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.