U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00805
  • Case Name: JACKSON v. PARAGON SYSTEMS, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • May 02, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Error]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule]
  • April 15, 2025: [Briefing Schedule]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 24, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.