U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03318
  • Case Name: KINDRED HOSPITAL BOSTON NORTH et al v. XAVIER BECERRA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 06, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 31, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to File Amicus Brief]
  • March 27, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • March 19, 2025: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.