U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00530
  • Case Name: BARAJAS et al v. VEYTIA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Error]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Returned as to private individual or business]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.