U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00463
  • Case Name: PUBLIC HEALTH REFORM ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [.Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Status Report Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.