U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00811
  • Case Name: AMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • April 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.