U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-03540
  • Case Name: POPE et al v. YAZAM INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Certify Class]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 28, 2025: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certify Class]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.