U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00821
  • Case Name: DCA HADLEY LTAC, LLC v. HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 24, 2025: [Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents]
  • March 20, 2025: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • March 20, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice to Counsel/Party]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 19, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.